RI H7642 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DELINQUENT AND DEPENDENT CHILDREN -- PROCEEDINGS IN FAMILY COURT - Prohibit the family court from detaining any juvenile or committing any juvenile, under the age of 14 years, to the training school, for any offense other than murder, first degree sexual assault, or an attempt to commit such offenses.
Title
Prohibit the family court from detaining any juvenile or committing any juvenile, under the age of 14 years, to the training school, for any offense other than murder, first degree sexual assault, or an attempt to commit such offenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] | Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Jennifer Boylan [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7642.pdf |