RI H7652 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes DMV to issue one year renewal registrations for vehicles leased for thirty-six months and enables DMV to refund, to a registrant of leased vehicle, who cancels registration that portion of registration fee paid that represents 6 months of fee.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Edward Cardillo [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing (06/23/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7652.pdf |