RI H7653 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Require anyone seeking the issuance or renewal of a hackney operator's license for the purpose of driving a taxicab, limited public motor vehicle, or public motor vehicle to undergo a national and state criminal background check.
Title
Drivers Of Taxicabs, Limited Public Motor Vehicles And Public Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-03-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |