RI H7669 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- PUBLIC ASSISTANCE ACT - Increases the department's standard, burial allowance payment from nine hundred dollars ($900) to one thousand five hundred dollars ($1,500).
Title
Increases the department's standard, burial allowance payment from nine hundred dollars ($900) to one thousand five hundred dollars ($1,500).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7669.pdf |