RI H7684 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Supporting The New England Secondary School Consortium
Title
Joint Resolution Supporting The New England Secondary School Consortium
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | Senate passed in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues | |
2010-02-25 | House read and passed |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7684.pdf |