RI H7686 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN SERVICES -- THE RHODE ISLAND WORKS PROGRAM - Amends works program to provide eligibility for benefits to pregnant persons from onset of pregnancy including lawful permanent residents, increases monthly cash benefits, disallows termination of benefits for failure to work, limits monetary sanctions.
Title
Amends works program to provide eligibility for benefits to pregnant persons from onset of pregnancy including lawful permanent residents, increases monthly cash benefits, disallows termination of benefits for failure to work, limits monetary sanctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - House - Passage As Amended (Y: 52 N: 6 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-14 - House - Passage Of Amendment (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-14 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |