RI H7742 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 30 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- SMALL CLAIMS AND CONSUMER CLAIMS - Amends procedures and fees relative to claims of appeal in small claims actions.
Title
Amends procedures and fees relative to claims of appeal in small claims actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-30 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-04-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-18 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/24/2024) |
2024-04-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- SMALL CLAIMS AND CONSUMER CLAIMS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE IN PARTICULAR ACTIONS -- SMALL CLAIMS AND CONSUMER CLAIMS