RI H7810 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Mark Nelson to join Victoria Lomas and Jacob Davenport in marriage on or about July 16, 2016, within the City of East Providence, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/12/2016) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-03-15 | House | House read and passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |