RI H7814 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- RENEWABLE ENERGY STANDARD - Requires the PUC to make public notification of any changes in eligibility or production of energy, and would direct the commission to promulgate rules and regulations to allow and facilitate the prompt public disclosure of this information.
Title
Requires the PUC to make public notification of any changes in eligibility or production of energy, and would direct the commission to promulgate rules and regulations to allow and facilitate the prompt public disclosure of this information.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] | Rep. Brian Newberry [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-01 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7814.pdf |