RI H7837 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for freedom of access without interference to entrances of clinics as well as places of religious worship.
Title
Freedom Of Access To Clinic Entrances And Places Of Religious Worship
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Handy [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Larry Valencia [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7837.pdf |