RI H7841 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the title of the "division of racing and athletics" to the "division of gaming and athletics licensing".
Title
Gaming And Athletics Licensing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-08-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/07/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Meeting postponed (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |