RI H7841 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies the status of pilot payments to the town of Exeter in view of its not presently having a police department.
Title
State Aid--town Of Exeter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2018) |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7841.pdf |