RI H7849 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for electronic system data transmission of Schedule V prescriptions.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. David Coughlin [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2016-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |