RI H7865 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-13 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PROPERTY -- CONDOMINIUM LAW - Provides that the "meetings" requirements from § 34-36.1-3.08 be applicable to condominiums created before July 1, 1982 and would permit remote participation in condominium meetings.
Title
Provides that the "meetings" requirements from § 34-36.1-3.08 be applicable to condominiums created before July 1, 1982 and would permit remote participation in condominium meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-05-09 | House | House read and passed |
2024-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/09/2024) |
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2024) |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |