RI H7924 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PERSONAL INCOME TAX -- CHILD TAX CREDIT - Establishes a child tax credit of one thousand dollars ($1,000) per dependent.
Title
Establishes a child tax credit of one thousand dollars ($1,000) per dependent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-27 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/02/2024) |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7924.pdf |