RI H7930 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- STATE TAX OFFICIALS - Reduces the minimum interest rate on delinquent payments from eighteen percent (18%) per annum to twelve percent (12%) per annum.
Title
Reduces the minimum interest rate on delinquent payments from eighteen percent (18%) per annum to twelve percent (12%) per annum.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Casey [D] | Rep. Alex Finkelman [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] |
Rep. Jon Brien [D] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Matthew Dawson [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing (05/02/2024) |
2024-03-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7930.pdf |