RI H7942 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Revise and clarifies the definition of an accessory dwelling unit in the zoning enabling act. Also permits certain accessory dwelling units to be counted towards low and moderate income housing requirements.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-24 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - House - Passage (Y: 52 N: 9 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2022-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/22/2022) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2022) |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2022-05-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/26/2022) |
2022-05-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-18 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/19/2022) |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (05/12/2022) |
2022-05-10 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |