RI H7951 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- RHODE ISLAND COMPREHENSIVE PLANNING AND LAND USE ACT - Provides amendments relative to the compliance and implementation of the comprehensive planning and use act including the conditions upon which limitations may be placed on land use applications by municipalities.
Title
Provides amendments relative to the compliance and implementation of the comprehensive planning and use act including the conditions upon which limitations may be placed on land use applications by municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-14 - Senate - Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2024-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/11/2024) |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2024-05-07 | House | House passed Sub A |
2024-05-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-04-26 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2024-04-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-03-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-22 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |