RI H7954 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restores the forty-seven percent (47%) distribution percentage with respect to hotel tax proceeds generated in the various regional districts and repeals the separate formula used for hosting platforms.
Title
Relating To State Affairs And Government
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] |
Rep. David Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2018) |
2018-03-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7954.pdf |