RI H7970 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Rhode Island Behavioral Health Care Reform Act of 2014," to ensure appropriate behavioral healthcare services are available to people in this state.
Title
Rhode Island Behavioral Health Care Reform Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Maria Cimini [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2014) |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7970.pdf |