RI H7972 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-10 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- PUBLIC UTILITIES - Expands the crime of false reporting to include shootings or other dangerous events.
Title
Expands the crime of false reporting to include shootings or other dangerous events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-06-06 | House | House read and passed |
2024-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-05-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |