RI H8065 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-26 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides in all civil cases where an order is issued for court fines, costs, or fees, which remain unpaid, the court shall schedule a review hearing within 2 years. If more than 2 years have elapsed any amount owed shall be waived and discharged.
Title
Courts - Judicial Administration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/26/2016) |
2016-04-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H8065.pdf |