RI H8206 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, a Rhode Island domestic nonprofit corporation, located in Warwick, Rhode Island.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-25 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8206.pdf |