RI H8279 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that 30% of any fine for littering collected pursuant to a complaint filed by a local law enforcement agency would inure to the benefit of that agency, with remittances to be made not less often than once every 3 months.
Title
Litter Control And Recycling
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-18 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-18 | House | House read and passed |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-06-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |