RI H8303 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-02 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes certain technical and date-related revisions regarding the settlement agreement of municipal retirees in the city of Central Falls.
Title
Retirement Of Municipal Employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-02 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-16 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |