RI H8318 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Meeting postponed (06/12/2024)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-11 - Meeting postponed (06/12/2024)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- CAUSES OF ACTION - Clarifies the statute of limitations for all causes of action not otherwise time barred that seek damages arising out of or related to the design/construction/supervision/or inspection of the Washington Bridge No. 700, located in East Prov. RI.
Title
Clarifies the statute of limitations for all causes of action not otherwise time barred that seek damages arising out of or related to the design/construction/supervision/or inspection of the Washington Bridge No. 700, located in East Prov. RI.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-11 | House | Meeting postponed (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2024-06-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Courts And Civil Procedure
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- CAUSES OF ACTION
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY
COURTS AND CIVIL PROCEDURE -- PROCEDURE GENERALLY -- CAUSES OF ACTION
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H8318.pdf |