RI S0203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Determination Of Need For New Health Care Equipment And New Institutional Health Services: would prohibit landlords of commercial property from limiting or restricting who may provide services to their tenants
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety - Determination Of Need For New Health Care Equipment And New Institutional Health Services
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Rhoda Perry [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-29 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-06-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2011-05-11 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-05 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-05 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2011-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0203.pdf |