RI S0957 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Career And Technical Education: would require the department of elementary and secondary education to promulgate regulations pertaining to career and technical education and would report annually on a number of metrics to the house and senate
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Career And Technical Education
Sponsors
Sen. David Bates [R] | Sen. Frank Devall [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] |
Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-06-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-06-28 | Senate passed as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-23 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-22 | House passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-15 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-15 | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-15 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate passed as amended | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage as amended | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-12 | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0957.pdf |