RI S1047 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Board Of Education Reconsider The Standardized Assessment Portion Of The State Graduation Requirements And Consider Alternative Methodologies
Title
Joint Resolution Respectfully Requesting That The Board Of Education Reconsider The Standardized Assessment Portion Of The State Graduation Requirements And Consider Alternative Methodologies
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Adam Satchell [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-20 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2013-07-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-03 | Senate | House passed in concurrence |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on House Calendar (07/03/2013) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/03/2013) |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S1047.pdf |