RI S2011 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides protections for consumers and small businesses in the areas of insurance, real estate and accountancy.
Title
Business Regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2016) |
2016-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |