RI S2013 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes operators of developmental disability agencies acting as a group acting as a group, to self-insure health care costs for employees, retirees and other beneficiaries, and allows a qualified third-party administrator to administer said program.
Title
Self-insurance Of Developmental Disability Agencies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/12/2016) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/05/2016) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |