RI S2017 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TOWNS AND CITIES -- LOW AND MODERATE INCOME HOUSING - Provides another method for municipalities to identify and calculate private residences as low- and moderate-income housing. This method is in addition to and not in lieu of other methods permitted under law.
Title
Provides another method for municipalities to identify and calculate private residences as low- and moderate-income housing. This method is in addition to and not in lieu of other methods permitted under law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2017.pdf |