RI S2053 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- THE BRIGHT TODAY SCHOLARSHIP AND OPEN ENROLLMENT EDUCATION ACT - Establishes a new educational program that allows students to enroll public and private schools of their choice.
Title
Establishes a new educational program that allows students to enroll public and private schools of their choice.
Sponsors
Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] |
Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Anthony Deluca [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2053.pdf |