RI S2057 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- THE EDUCATION EQUITY AND PROPERTY TAX RELIEF ACT - Establishes ongoing two percent (2%) regionalization bonus to Education Equity and Property Tax Relief Act.
Title
Establishes ongoing two percent (2%) regionalization bonus to Education Equity and Property Tax Relief Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2057.pdf |