RI S2059 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend method by which the state assessment program would be implemented in public schools. The act would provide that no state assessment conducted pursuant to chapter 16-97 and prior to 7/1/17, would be used to determine student's eligibility to graduate
Title
The Rhode Island Board Of Education Act
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | House passed Sub A as amended |
2014-06-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended |
2014-06-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/20/2014) |
2014-05-15 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2014) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2014) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |