RI S2066 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt the trade-in value of pickup trucks under 8,100 lbs gross weight used exclusively for personal use from sales tax as presently available to automobiles
Title
Sales And Use Taxes--liability And Computation
Sponsors
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. Leonidas Raptakis [D] | Sen. Roger Picard [D] | Sen. Marc Cote [D] |
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2066.pdf |