RI S2083 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate the tax on pet care services
Title
Sales And Use Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee heard |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2083.pdf |