RI S2083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the definition of "elder person" for purposes of exploitation of elders from a person sixty-five (65) years of age or older to a person sixty (60) years of age or older.
Title
Exploitation Of Elders
Sponsors
Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2020) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2083.pdf |