RI S2083 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BUSINESSES AND PROFESSIONS -- NURSES - Amends the conditions upon which a nurse would be exempt from certain licensing requirements to include eligibility to practice, before taking and receiving results of the National Council Licensure Examination (NCLEX).
Title
Amends the conditions upon which a nurse would be exempt from certain licensing requirements to include eligibility to practice, before taking and receiving results of the National Council Licensure Examination (NCLEX).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-25 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |