RI S2116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Grant to local licensing authorities the discretion to relieve holders of Class E licenses from the requirement of maintaining/operating/managing/conducting a drug store as a condition of the continued holding of a Class A license
Title
Retail Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-04-01 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-11 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-03-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2014) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/05/2014) |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |