RI S2129 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Office Of State Medical Examiners (would Add One Non-voting Member To The State Medical Examiners Commission Who Would Be A Representative From The New England Organ Bank And Who Need Not Be A Rhode Island Resident)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Office Of State Medical Examiners (would Add One Non-voting Member To The State Medical Examiners Commission Who Would Be A Representative From The New England Organ Bank And Who Need Not Be A Rhode Island Resident)
Sponsors
Sen. Leo Blais [R] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-06-03 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-03 | Committee heard | |
2010-03-03 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-04 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2129.pdf |