RI S2137 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expand the powers of the department of environmental management relating to agriculture and farming by creating a new division of agriculture.
Title
Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/21/2014) |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/16/2014) |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |