RI S2156 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTION AND BENEFITS - Increases the maximum post retirement employment earnings from eighteen thousand dollars ($18,000) to twenty-five thousand dollars ($25,000) a year for certain retired educators.
Title
Increases the maximum post retirement employment earnings from eighteen thousand dollars ($18,000) to twenty-five thousand dollars ($25,000) a year for certain retired educators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-11 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2024) |
2024-06-06 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-04 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2024) |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/23/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTION AND BENEFITS
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM -- CONTRIBUTION AND BENEFITS