RI S2168 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-19 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- SCHOOL FUNDS AND PROPERTY - Directs the department of education to develop and adopt regulations for energy capable school buildings.
Title
Directs the department of education to develop and adopt regulations for energy capable school buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2168.pdf |