RI S2179 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- UNIFORM TELEHEALTH ACT - Allows an out-of-state health care practitioner to provide telehealth services to a patient located in this state if the services are consistent with the practitioner's scope of practice and state and federal professional standards.
Title
Allows an out-of-state health care practitioner to provide telehealth services to a patient located in this state if the services are consistent with the practitioner's scope of practice and state and federal professional standards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2179.pdf |