RI S2205 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Meeting postponed (05/18/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Meeting postponed (05/18/2016)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants the town council of the town of Narragansett the authority to adopt a homestead exemption ordinance.
Title
Homestead Exemption In The Town Of Narragansett
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Gee [R] | Sen. John Pagliarini [R] | Sen. Nicholas Kettle [R] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] |
Sen. William Conley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2205.pdf |