RI S2205 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINALS -- CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTIONS -- PAROLE - Provides that prisoners who committed offenses prior to age 18 and sentenced as adults would be eligible for parole after completing 15 yrs of their sentence/does not lengthen their eligibility should prisoner be eligible for parole earlier than 15 yrs.
Title
Provides that prisoners who committed offenses prior to age 18 and sentenced as adults would be eligible for parole after completing 15 yrs of their sentence/does not lengthen their eligibility should prisoner be eligible for parole earlier than 15 yrs.
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] |
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Jonathon Acosta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2205.pdf |