RI S2216 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CRIMINAL OFFENSES -- WEAPONS - Prohibits the sale or possession of firearm silencers unless the person complies with federal law in the sale, possession and use.
Title
Prohibits the sale or possession of firearm silencers unless the person complies with federal law in the sale, possession and use.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] | Sen. Jessica de la Cruz [R] | Sen. Thomas Paolino [R] | Sen. Anthony Deluca [R] |
Sen. Elaine Morgan [R] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2024) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2216.pdf |