RI S2225 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-06 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution In Support Of Country Of Origin Labeling (cool) For Pharmaceuticals
Title
Senate Resolution In Support Of Country Of Origin Labeling (cool) For Pharmaceuticals
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/06/2014) |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/29/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |