RI S2231 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Further defines the duties of the department of elderly affairs with regard to elder caregiver respite services.
Title
Elderly Affairs Department
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] |
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-23 - House - Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-23 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-23 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/23/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-19 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-04-04 | House | Referred to House H.E.W. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/03/2018) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |